THE SOBRIETY PROJECT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sobriety Project makes use of the inland waterways system, its environment, heritage and culture as resources for education training and community integration. It offers open access and support to individuals by creating innovative opportunities to raise their expectations self confidence and social mobility.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2018
Total income includes £12,387 from 2 government contract(s) and £9,861 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Wakefield
- City Of York
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 July 1980: Standard registration
- 15 March 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE WATERWAYS MUSEUM AND ADVENTURE CENTRE (Working name)
- WATERSTART THORNE SUREWATERS SELBY (Working name)
- THE "SOBRIETY" PROJECT (Previous name)
- THE SOBRIETY PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £370.27k | £420.08k | £429.09k | £294.61k | £334.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £449.12k | £426.25k | £406.41k | £373.12k | £410.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £30.38k | £30.83k | £22.40k | £12.39k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £9.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | |||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | |||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | |||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES DATED 12 MAY 1980
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE (I) THROUGH IN PROVISION ON THE HUMBER KEEL 'SOBRIETY' OR ON ANY OTHER SUITABLE VESSEL OR VESSELS WHICH THE ASSOCIATION MAY HEREAFTER ACQUIRE OR ELSEWHERE OF ACCOMMODATION AND TRANSPORT AND EDUCATIONAL COURSES SEMINARS AND LECTURES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS AFORESAID WHO ARE ENGAGED IN FIELD WORK IN GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY, BIOLOGY ETC. SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE NORTH LINVOLNSHIRE NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE CITY AND COUNTY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window