Trustees SALTASH U3A
Charity Number: 1172928

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christpher Patrick Masterson | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Geoffrey Williams | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Francis Earl | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
June Rosemary Nankervis | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Denise de Beaufort | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Olver | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert George Jenkins | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Pym | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cdr Peter Payne-Hanlon OBE | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Lamb | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Olver | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA SMITH | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.