THE VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL E17

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide childcare and education for children 2 - 5 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £134,159 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 28 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melissa Richards Clack | Chair | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Atkinson | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Finney | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Henderson | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Ramsay | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.70k | £126.45k | £133.74k | £129.31k | £213.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.90k | £119.58k | £126.17k | £175.35k | £193.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £109.28k | N/A | £106.91k | £96.41k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £134.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walthamstow Cricket & Tennis Club
48a Greenway Avenue
LONDON
E17 3QN
- Phone:
- 020 3643 3839
- Email:
- info@villagepreschoole17.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window