Trustees NORTH SOMERSET LGBT+ FORUM
Charity number: 1174545

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE WINTER-GRAY | Chair | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Kelly | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ethan Shewring | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jade Lyddon | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura John | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS DAVID WINTER-GRAY | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DOBLE | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
THERESA WILLS | Trustee | 30 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.