ART FOR CURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Art for Cure Enterprises (a wholly owned subsidiary of Art for Cure) hosts sales of art and sculpture and other events to raise funds which are subsequently passed up to Art for Cure for distribution in accordance with our charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEX GRAY | Chair | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clare Burgess | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David George Sutton | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ilyena Froud | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Crocker | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA ELIZABETH GRAY | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.73k | £93.71k | £168.15k | £220.23k | £20.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.76k | £151.08k | £67.15k | £168.89k | £174.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO REDUCING THE INCIDENCE OF BREAST CANCER AND THE PROVISION OF CARE TO SUFFERERS OF BREAST CANCER FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS THAT RESEARCH CURES FOR BREAST CANCER IN THE UK AND TO ORGANISATIONS THAT PROVIDE CARE TO SUFFERERS OF BREAST CANCER IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS WHERE ART FOR CURE HAS RAISED MONEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BREDFIELD HOUSE
BREDFIELD
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 6AA
- Phone:
- 01394388113
- Email:
- belinda@artforcure.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window