AL NOOR ISLAMIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Islamic Teaching & Prayer activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 14 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD HABIB KHAN | Chair | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAZWAN IRFAN | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED LATIF | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD ILYAS | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/02/2020 | 03/02/2021 | 03/02/2022 | 03/02/2023 | 03/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.90k | £65.59k | £105.53k | £114.63k | £112.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.90k | £55.09k | £91.24k | £95.93k | £50.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 February 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 February 2023 | 26 May 2024 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2023 | 26 May 2024 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 February 2022 | 25 May 2024 | 539 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2022 | 25 May 2024 | 539 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 February 2021 | 24 May 2024 | 903 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2021 | 24 May 2024 | 903 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 February 2020 | 23 February 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2020 | 23 May 2024 | 1267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS (ÆOBJECTSÆ) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAM INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED) TO FACILITATING AND ORGANISING EACH THE FOLLOWING: 2 (A) THE INDIVIDUAL AND COMMUNAL DAILY PRAYERS (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ÔSALAATÖ) (B) THE COMMUNAL PRAYER MADE ON FRIDAYS (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ÔJUMAAHÖ) (C) THE REGULAR COMMUNAL GATHERINGS FOR THE REMEMBRANCE OF GOD AND FOR THE RECITATION OF EXTRACTS OF THE QURAN (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ÔZIKRÖ). (D) THE COLLECTIVE OFFERING OF PEACE AND BLESSINGS UPON THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) BOTH IMMEDIATELY FOLLOWING THE COMMUNAL DAILY PRAYERS AND THE COMMUNAL FRIDAY PRAYER AND OTHERWISE (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS PRAYING ÔDUROOD AU SALAAMÖ); (E) THE REMEMBRANCE AND CELEBRATION OF THE BIRTH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ÔEID MILAD UN NABIÖ); (F) THE COMMUNAL FUNERAL PRAYER (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ÔJANAZAHÖ) AND PRAYERS OF REMEMBRANCE FOR THE DECEASED (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ÔKHATAMSÖ OR ÔESALE E SAWAABÖ); (G) THE MONTHLY PRAYERS AS AN ACT OF REMEMBRANCE AND BLESSINGS FOR SAYYIDUNA SHEIKH ABDUL QAADIR JILANI (MAY GOD BE PLEASED WITH HIM) IN EACH ISLAMIC CALENDAR MONTH (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ÔGHIYARWEEN SHAREEFÖ) (H) THE REMEMBRANCE AND CELEBRATION OF ALL THE SAINTS ACCEPTED BY MUSLIMS (MAY GOD BE PLEASED WITH THEM) (BEING COLLECTIVELY MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ÔAULIA ALLAHÖ); (I) THE PRAISING AND OFFERING OF BLESSINGS UPON THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) THROUGH THE RECITATION OF POETRY AND BY ANY OTHER MEANS; (J) SUCH OTHER PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND EDUCATIONAL AND/OR RELIGIOUS EVENTS AS THE MEMBERS MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME. 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jamia Mosque
1 Capper Street
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST6 5TB
- Phone:
- 07861 304832
- Email:
- milyas1967@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window