THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL-BASED TEACHER TRAINERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education of pupils in schools through the raising of standards and development of high quality learning and teaching by: Promoting programmes of initial training, education and professional development of teachers; Representing, supporting and developing the interests of schools-led teacher training; Providing a forum for sharing information and evidence-based research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£555,721
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £544.04k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £11.68k |
Total expenditure:
£674,087
Raising funds | £50.70k | |
Charitable activities | £623.39k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £50.70k | |
Charitable expenditure | £623.39k |
People

6 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 December 2017: CIO registration
- NASBTT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Richards | Chair | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Scutt MBE | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kikelomo Teresa Grace Agunbiade | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Damilola Dauda | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Anderson | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Rodgers | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ford | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sidikat Taiwo | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison O'Dornan | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW OGDEN | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PARKER | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK GARTON | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE HARNDEN | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|||||
KIM FRANCIS | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £408.91k | £354.95k | £489.97k | £619.76k | £555.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £336.00k | £359.20k | £429.07k | £536.76k | £674.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £614.43k | £544.04k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.33k | £11.68k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £490.43k | £623.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £46.33k | £50.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.43k | £18.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £393.40k | £266.62k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £57.32k | £48.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL-BASED TEACHER TRAINERS (NASBTT) IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PUPILS/CHILDREN IN SCHOOLS THROUGH THE RAISING OF STANDARDS AND DEVELOPMENT OF HIGH QUALITY LEARNING AND TEACHING BY: A) PROMOTING PROGRAMMES OF INITIAL TRAINING, EDUCATION AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF TEACHERS B) REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND DEVELOPING SCHOOLS-LED/DRIVEN TEACHER TRAINING C) FACILITATING CO-OPERATION/COMMUNICATION BETWEEN MEMBER INSTITUTIONS D) PROVIDING A FORUM FOR SHARING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE-BASED RESEARCH E) REPRESENTING THE INTERESTS OF SCHOOLS-LED INITIAL TEACHER TRAINING (ITT) PROVISION IN RELATION TO THE DEVELOPMENT, IMPLEMENTATION AND INFLUENCING OF NATIONAL POLICY TO THE EXTENT THIS IS PERMISSIBLE WITHIN THE LEGAL FRAMEWORK FOR A CHARITY IN ENGLAND AND WALES F) SUPPORTING THOSE WITH RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE OVERALL MANAGEMENT OF SCHOOLS-LED ITT PROVISION, SCHOOLS AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS PRESENT OR FUTURE
Contact information
- Address:
-
UoN Innovation Centre
Green Street
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 1SY
- Phone:
- 07841434235
- Email:
- info@nasbtt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window