Mide's Charitable Trust

Charity number: 1175566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Alleviating poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ARAMIDE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
  • FIDLER'S HELPING HAND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rilwan Balogun Trustee 04 January 2021
None on record
MORENIKE WURAOLA KEHINDE Trustee 03 November 2017
None on record
TAWAKALITU FADAHUNSI Trustee 30 October 2016
None on record
ADERONKE OMOTOLA FIDLER Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.40k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £69 £869 £400 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2024 325 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2024 325 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 February 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 February 2023 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Evergreen
Crays Hill
BILLERICAY
CM11 2XP
Phone:
07534835186
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available