OUR WARM WELCOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To prevent or relieve poverty amongst those seeking asylum and those granted refugee status, and their dependents, living (temporarily or permanently) in St Helens and the surrounding area, in particular but not exclusively by the provision of information, advice, language skills, food, household goods and education and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £452 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- St Helens
Governance
- 21 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KEVIN DUFFY | Chair | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gordon John Pennington | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE COTTRELL | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN ELIZABETH LAWRENSON MBE | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.61k | £20.80k | £47.50k | £41.36k | £27.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.55k | £9.89k | £43.30k | £37.80k | £31.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.34k | £11.34k | £9.12k | £17.76k | £452 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS, AND THEIR DEPENDENTS, LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN ST HELENS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, AND LANGUAGE SKILLS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS, AND THEIR DEPENDENTS, LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN ST HELENS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY 3. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS, AND THEIR DEPENDENTS, LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN ST HELENS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 4. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS, AND THEIR DEPENDENTS, LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN ST HELENS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 5. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORPUS CHRISTI RC CHURCH PRESBYTERY
ALFRED STREET
RAINFORD
ST. HELENS
WA11 8BY
- Phone:
- 01744882157
- Email:
- kevin@Ourwarmwelcome.co.uk
- Website:
-
Not yet operational
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window