FRIENDS OF MASQUE (S.O.T.) THEATRE GROUP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of disabled adults by supporting the charitable works, both financially and with personal volunteers, of the Masque Theatre Company in such ways as the trustees shall see fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 10 October 2017: CIO registration
- FRIENDS OF MASQUE THEATRE GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Milnes | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANN WATERS | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.52k | £6.95k | £1.48k | £5.83k | £9.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.59k | £7.54k | £2.29k | £6.35k | £7.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 06 March 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 06 March 2024 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED ADULTS BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF MASQUE THEATRE GROUP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 UTTOXETER ROAD
DRAYCOTT
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST11 9AB
- Phone:
- 07896049719
- Email:
- hello@friendsofmasque.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window