ENGAGEMALVERN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to empower the local community to address key social justice issues and to advance education in citizenship, science, religion, ethics and philosophy. We will form alliances with community groups to negotiate with decision makers, will encourage debates on key social justice issues and hold weekend events on the issues described above. We operate in the wider Malvern area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Herefordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Robert Webb | Chair | 08 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Marcus Allan Cleaver | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Goodenough | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|||||
PROF BARRY EDWARD JONES | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.69k | £18.49k | £16.46k | £12.01k | £16.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.83k | £14.06k | £15.24k | £11.39k | £16.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.47k | N/A | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF MALVERN AND ITS SURROUNDING VILLAGES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN MALVERN AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES IN SOUTH WORCESTERSHIRE AND NORTH HEREFORDSHIRE IN THE AREAS OF CITIZENSHIP, SCIENCE, RELIGION, PHILOSOPHY AND ETHICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Willow Grove
MALVERN
Worcestershire
WR14 2SE
- Phone:
- 01684565708
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
engagemalvern.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window