Financial history SET EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1175825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.38k £5.96k £6.30k £6.53k £6.30k
Total expenditure £7.38k £7.45k £4.40k £7.43k £425
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A