THE WOND'ROUS MACHINE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music, dance and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 August 2017: CIO registration
- 06 December 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 06 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1024838 THE WIGMORE HALL TRUST
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.22k | £2.19k | £8.03k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.02k | £13.80k | £13.09k | £360 | £883 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 August 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 August 2023 | 41 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 70 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSIC, LITERATURE, DANCE, THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE; (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN MUSIC, LITERATURE, THE ARTS, DANCE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITING THE SCOPE OF THE OBJECTS IN CLAUSES 3(1) AND (2)) BY MEANS OF (A) EDUCATING INDIVIDUALS AND THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN MUSIC, LITERATURE, DANCE, AND ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF ALL KINDS BY THE CREATION AND MAINTENANCE OF ENSEMBLES, ORCHESTRAS, AND GROUPS OF ALL KINDS FOR THE PRODUCTION, PRESENTATION, DISCUSSION AND FURTHERANCE OF MUSICAL, LITERARY, ARTISTIC AND OTHER WORKS, AND WORKS OF DANCE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE, AND THE PRESENTATION OF AND/OR PARTICIPATION OF WORKS OF MUSIC, LITERATURE, ART, DANCE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE IN FESTIVALS, CONCERTS, EVENTS, LECTURES, SEMINARS AND DISCUSSIONS OF ALL KINDS; (B) GIVING COMPOSERS, ARTISTS AND PERFORMERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE (ESPECIALLY THOSE AT OR NEAR THE START OF THEIR PROFESSIONAL CAREERS) A PLATFORM FOR PERFORMANCE AND EXHIBITION AND THE OPPORTUNITY TO PERFORM AND EXHIBIT AND HAVE THEIR WORKS PERFORMED AND EXHIBITED WITH OTHER ARTISTS AND PERFORMERS AND/OR TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND (C) PROVIDING MUSIC, LITERARY, DANCE, ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE EDUCATION TO EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE PARTICULARLY TO THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED IN ANY WAY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window