SEASIDE HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to further or benefit the residents of Eastbourne and the neighbourhood, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 11 December 2017: CIO registration
- SEASIDE COMMUNITY HUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tina Angela Fenner | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Morris | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARY DUBERY | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.83k | £79.31k | £53.51k | £24.83k | £19.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.26k | £31.76k | £56.14k | £73.32k | £14.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.86k | N/A | £6.13k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF EASTBOURNE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
125 -127 Seaside
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN22 7NN
- Phone:
- 01323371322
- Email:
- seasidehub@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
seasidecommunityhub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window