FEMINIST LIBRARY AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Feminist Library provides a reference resource, meeting place and programme of activities relating to feminism. It is the largest collection of Second Wave Feminist material in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 September 2017: CIO registration
- 22 March 2019: Funds received from 272410 FEMINIST LIBRARY AND INFORMATION CENTRE
- FEMINIST LIBRARY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alice Arkwright | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hareem Ghani | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Beale | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emem Attah | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.68k | £53.36k | £55.45k | £107.16k | £53.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.75k | £34.74k | £56.42k | £110.03k | £56.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 May 2021 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2017 as amended on 31 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BY: 1) OPERATING AND MAINTAINING FOR GENERAL USE A SPECIALIST LIBRARY OF FICTION, NON-FICTION AND ARCHIVE RESEARCH MATERIALS RELATING TO THE POSITION OF WOMEN IN SOCIETY AND; 2) PROVIDING OTHER FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE POSITION OF WOMEN IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOJOURNER TRUTH COMMUNITY CENTRE
161 SUMNER ROAD
LONDON
SE15 6JL
- Phone:
- 0207 261 0879
- Email:
- admin@feministlibrary.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window