NEW CONNEXIONS FREE CHURCH ELY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Connexions is an Evangelical Church serving the community in the Barns Area of Ely
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 November 2017: CIO registration
- NC@HB (Working name)
- NEW CONNEXIONS @ HIGH BARNS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW ELLIS | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES LOWMAN | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL GRIEF | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE TUBB | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
STUART JOHN ALDRIDGE | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
GLYNNIS DRONUIK | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.30k | £20.31k | £17.92k | £6.85k | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.93k | £12.52k | £9.05k | £4.28k | £692 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ELY, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 7
Rosie Court
Newnham Street
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB7 4PQ
- Phone:
- 07913639072
- Email:
- ncfccharitycontact@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window