UK FRIENDS OF THE STOCKHOLM SCHOOL OF ECONOMICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs a program of networking, educational and fundraising activities, primarily aimed at UK based alumni of the Stockholm School of Economics and with the aim to make donations to organisations in line with the objectives of the Charitable Incorporated Organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Sweden
Governance
- 27 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerstin Elisabet Mogull | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anette Marie Elfving Ferm | Trustee | 31 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andreas Schorling | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GUDRUN BIRGITTA MARIA ALBAGE GOUGH-COOPER | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor LARS G÷RAN STRANNEGÕRD | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sven Hakan Gomer | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.98k | £111.26k | £144.63k | £52.81k | £64.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £247.64k | £115.36k | £58.30k | £115.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO PROMOTE EDUCATION BY SUPPORTING SUCH OF THE ACTIVITIES OF THE STOCKHOLM SCHOOL OF ECONOMICS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shaw Gibbs
Salatin House
19 Cedar Road
Sutton
SM2 5DA
- Phone:
- 07770915120
- Email:
- info@ukfriendsofsse.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window