THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, BELMONT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church used for public worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 26 May 2017: Standard registration
- ÔTHE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, BELMONT (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Holroyd | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Corbett | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Jackson | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN REYNOLDS | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GERALD IONS | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE REYNOLDS | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK HOLROYD | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE WINKLESS | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MEGAN PORT | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY JANE MOORE | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BEKEN | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Corbett | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|||||
JEAN FOULDS | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY MOORE | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ALAN PORT | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.06k | £91.03k | £98.95k | £98.48k | £85.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.67k | £92.59k | £100.83k | £107.19k | £110.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.34k | £10.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST MARY MAGDALENE CHURCH
BROOMSIDE LANE
BELMONT
DURHAM
DH1 2QR
- Phone:
- 01913867224
- Email:
- marymagbelmont@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window