Financial history HOPE VINEYARD CHURCH OXFORD

Charity number: 1173765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £64.82k £94.67k £39.21k £64.97k £70.28k
Total expenditure £33.96k £55.98k £42.05k £58.06k £85.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.29k N/A N/A £400