ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION RAF ST MAWGAN BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting through the comradeship engendered by members of the RAF St Mawgan Branch of the RAF Association, the welfare by charitable means of the RAF community primarily in and around the Newquay/Wadebridge area and in Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 31 May 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER COX | Chair | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Ramsey | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Waterson | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Dewberry | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.78k | £1.16k | £20.03k | £12.47k | £14.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.81k | £223 | £8.54k | £21.66k | £12.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2024 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 January 2022 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 20 JAN 1953
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE, THROUGH THE COMRADESHIP ENGENDERED BY ITS MEMBERS, THE WELFARE BY CHARITABLE MEANS OF ALL SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF OUR AIR FORCES, THEIR SPOUSES AND DEPENDANTS, TOGETHER WITH THE WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS AND DEPENDANTS OF THOSE WHO DIED WHILST SERVING OR SUBSEQUENTLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAFA RAF ST MAWGAN BRANCH
RAF St. Mawgan
NEWQUAY
CORNWALL
TR8 4HP
- Phone:
- 07740407681
- Email:
- rafastmawgan@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window