LISTER HILL BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES INCLUDE BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO - REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP, BIBLE STUDY, PREACHING/TEACHING; BAPTISM AS DEFINED IN THE UNION'S DECLARATION OF PRINCIPLE; COMMUNION; EVANGELISM/MISSION; TEACHING; NURTURE/GROWTH OF CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES; EDUCATION/TRAINING; GIVING/ENCOURAGING OF PASTORAL CARE; SUPPORTING CHARITABLE SOCIAL ACTION; RELATIONSHIPS WITH BAPTISTS AND OTHER CHRISTIANS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 11 July 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Liles | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara McLaren | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Green | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Fairburn | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rushfirth | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Helm | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Stirland | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Parker | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Stirland | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.89k | £85.90k | £78.01k | £95.53k | £93.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.96k | £56.86k | £54.03k | £100.20k | £96.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lister Hill Baptist Church
1 Brownberrie Avenue
Horsforth
Leeds
LS18 5PW
- Phone:
- 0113 258 4506
- Email:
- office@lhbc.org.uk
- Website:
-
lhbc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window