Financial history SEASONS FOR GROWTH GRIEF EDUCATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1173121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £33.98k £33.98k £49.49k £46.76k £29.64k
Total expenditure £22.31k £22.31k £31.11k £44.94k £46.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A