Financial history DURHAM AREA YOUTH

Charity number: 1174888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £139.01k £148.13k £143.82k £249.77k £308.60k
Total expenditure £108.27k £119.21k £128.19k £216.74k £287.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.41k
Income from government grants £28.34k £140.40k £15.39k £50.69k £62.32k