'FRIENDS OF ST AUGUSTINES'

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the social isolation of the elderly in Addlestone, Surrey, by providing or assisting in the provision of equipment, facilities, activities and services over and above those provided for the residents of St Augustine's Residential Care Home, particularly with a view to helping the residents of the care home undertake rewarding activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MIKE WAYLAND MBE | Chair | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
BETTY CHRISTINE WAYLAND | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE O'LEARY | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SPEARS | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE CUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
NINA STRONG | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER CARTER | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET THOMPSON | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £486 | £917 | £3.22k | £1.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.21k | £1.54k | £2.43k | £1.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2025 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 05 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: TO RELIEVE THE SOCIAL ISOLATION OF THE ELDERLY IN ADDLESTONE, SURREY, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES OVER AND ABOVE THOSE PROVIDED FOR THE RESIDENTS OF ST AUGUSTINE'S RESIDENTIAL CARE HOME, PARTICULARLY WITH A VIEW TO HELPING THE RESIDENTS OF THE CARE HOME UNDERTAKE REWARDING ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
156 CHERTSEY ROAD
ADDLESTONE
KT15 2EJ
- Phone:
- 07951417940
- Email:
- m_c_wayland@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window