CHRISTOS LAZARI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees have referred to the guidance provided by the Charity Commission on public benefit and its reporting when setting out its aims and objectives and in planning future activities. The aim of the Foundation is to promote charitable causes for public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cyprus
- Greece
Governance
- 25 July 2017: Standard registration
- THE CHRISTOS LAZARI FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZOE PROTOPAPAS | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|||||
ANDRIE LAZARI | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOS PETOUSSIS | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARITSA LAZARI | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS LAZARI | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leonidas Lazari | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.83k | £187.48k | £195.45k | £196.96k | £205.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.20k | £54.62k | £267.99k | £201.13k | £152.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT (THE ‘OBJECTS’). 1.2 THE OBJECTS WILL BE FURTHERED THROUGH THE APPLICATION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS; AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION: 1.2.1 TO THE GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH AND OTHER FAITH ORGANISATIONS; 1.2.2 TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WITH LINKS TO OR ASSOCIATIONS WITH GREECE OR CYPRUS; 1.2.3 FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH THROUGH SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH IN THE UK; AND 1.2.4 FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 St. George Street
LONDON
W1S 2FA
- Phone:
- 02073885444
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window