HONITON TOWN COMMUNITY FOOTBALL AND SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a local charity that provides opportunities to local children through the provision on sports facilities and coaching, primarily Youth Football coaching and participation in local Youth Football leagues (competitive and non-competitive).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 22 February 2018: CIO registration
- HONITON TOWN YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN JAMES LEISK | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVIES | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL ROE-LAVERY | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.90k | £21.43k | £2.64k | £39.80k | £38.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.01k | £12.95k | £10.85k | £26.58k | £26.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 02 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | 02 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (“FACILITIES” MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); (2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITHIN THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OR LIFE; AND (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROSEMOUNT HOUSE
ROSEMOUNT LANE
HONITON
EX14 1RN
- Phone:
- 0140441842
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window