KOWITZ FAMILY FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1174394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the trust is to use its funds for the benefit of the general public. The charity uses its funds by making donations to institutions and individuals which the trustees deem appropriate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £315,015
Total expenditure: £224,298

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 August 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL ROWLEY Trustee 27 April 2017
THE EMET FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SARAH HELENA KOWITZ Trustee 27 April 2017
THE RYE ART GALLERY TRUST
Received: On time
David Nathan Kowitz Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £404.35k £275.08k £293.78k £130.10k £315.02k
Total expenditure £376.41k £276.71k £317.69k £142.50k £224.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 11 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 March 2025 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 March 2025 131 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 4
25 St. James's Place
LONDON
SW1A 1NH
Phone:
0207 629 8284
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available