EIN CYFLE CIO

Charity number: 1175085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We help people with co-occurring problems to recover through: Developing a unified therapeutic model and service structure which combines the best practice from both mental health and substance misuse services. Developing and delivering unified services and learning from these. Sharing our approach and learning widely to enable other providers to reform and improve their services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 2017: CIO registration
  • 10 March 2020: Funds received from 1145452 STAFELL FYW CAERDYDD/LIVING ROOM CARDIFF
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ADFERIAD RECOVERY (Previous name)
  • ADFERIAD RECOVERY LTD (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Dyfrig ap Dafydd Trustee 21 September 2022
WELSH CENTRE FOR ACTION ON DEPENDENCY AND ADDICTION LTD
Received: On time
Howard Jones Trustee 01 April 2021
DIVERSE EXCELLENCE CYMRU
Received: On time
ADFERIAD RECOVERY LIMITED
Received: On time
HAFAL
Received: On time
Simon Paul Green Trustee 25 April 2019
WELSH CENTRE FOR ACTION ON DEPENDENCY AND ADDICTION LTD
Received: On time
DIVERSE EXCELLENCE CYMRU
Received: On time
ADFERIAD RECOVERY LIMITED
Received: On time
Clive Wolfendale Trustee 28 November 2017
THE ADAMSON MILITARY BAND
Recently registered
DIVERSE EXCELLENCE CYMRU
Received: On time
WELSH CENTRE FOR ACTION ON DEPENDENCY AND ADDICTION LTD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £471.65k £295.13k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £362.03k £277.21k £278.47k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £44.58k £92.03k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £74.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Adferiad Recovery Ltd
36 Princes Drive
Colwyn Bay
Conwy
LL29 8LA
Phone:
01492863007