WESTCLIFF COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide and assist local residence with their preferred activities and needs, ie bingo, luncheon club, supper night, carpet bowls, card & dominoes Running leisure trips and entertainment and hire of rooms for other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £67,204 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 September 1980: Standard registration
- 24 May 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 May 2022: Funds transferred to 1143693 Westcliff Community Drop-In Centre
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.18k | £94.18k | £99.99k | £93.54k | £80.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.15k | £90.15k | £105.19k | £99.92k | £63.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £67.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 March 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 March 2022 | 30 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
10 May 2021 | 99 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 10 May 2021 | 465 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2019
(These accounts |
10 May 2021 | 465 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1976
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ASHBY ROAD WEST, BURRINGTON ROAD NORTH, KINGSWAY SOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window