Financial history SOUTHAMPTON CIRCLE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1173226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £30.80k £31.46k £33.61k £34.97k £40.52k
Total expenditure £29.49k £28.77k £26.09k £39.46k £35.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A