Accounts and annual returns BISONG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1175108
Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 11 October 2024 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 30 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 12 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 12 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 02 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window