Financial history BISONG FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1175108
Charity reporting is overdue by 423 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023
Total gross income £8.70k £2.84k £14.26k £19.26k £0
Total expenditure £10.86k £3.88k £11.61k £20.30k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A