BISONG FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST CHILDREN IN CAMEROON BY SUPPORTING ORPHANAGES THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG ORPHANED CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 18 IN CAMEROON BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THE NECESSARY SKILLS TO IMPROVE EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Cameroon
Governance
- 11 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL NKONGHO BISONG | Chair | 03 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.70k | £2.84k | £14.26k | £19.26k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.86k | £3.88k | £11.61k | £20.30k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 414 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 11 OCT 2017 AMENDED ON 18 JAN 2020 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST CHILDREN IN CAMEROON BY SUPPORTING ORPHANAGES. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG ORPHANED CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 18 IN CAMEROON BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THE NECESSARY SKILLS TO IMPROVE EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3. THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ON THE GROUNDS OF GENDER AND DISABILITY. 4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RAISING AWARENESS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND KNIFE CRIME IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 DENGAINE CLOSE
PAPWORTH EVERARD
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 3UH
- Phone:
- 07956757504
- Email:
- mail@bisongfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window