FITTLEWORTH VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are to establish and run a village hall, for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Fittleworth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 October 2017: CIO registration
- 06 August 2019: Funds received from 305372 FITTLEWORTH VILLAGE HALL
- FVH (Working name)
- FITTLEWORTH VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- FITTLEWORTH VILLAGE HALL CIO (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanne Haywood | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Cook | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Dunstan | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Francois | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Parker | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Braham | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
LINDA BALL | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Tanner | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
WADE HOULDEN | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.66k | £18.77k | £23.04k | £22.33k | £23.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.89k | £33.39k | £12.86k | £15.32k | £14.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FITTLEWORTH ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fittleworth Village Hall
School Lane
FITTLEWORTH
PULBOROUGH
RH20 1JB
- Phone:
- 07801782038
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window