Financial history ROSETTA ART CENTRE CIO

Charity number: 1177462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £303.75k £335.21k £363.73k £414.09k £370.56k
Total expenditure £206.65k £155.05k £301.43k £364.49k £441.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £7.82k £28.42k
Income from government grants £112.89k £291.99k £95.83k £85.49k £190.63k