ROSETTA ART CENTRE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rosetta Arts delivers exciting, innovative and creative courses for people in Newham. We reach out to those who otherwise have little access to the rich and transformative benefits of the arts and education. At the heart of our programming there is something for all stages of a person's creative learning and development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,423 from 5 government contract(s) and £190,631 from 5 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
Governance
- 07 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aida Esposito | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Sumeetha Islam | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Clarke | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Jones | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Felistas Nobenkosi Ndebele | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Robinson | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Waleed Sajjad | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Garnett | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Merkle | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cameron | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amber Stephanie Perrier | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL FORRESTER FRSA | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR BURGESS | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £303.75k | £335.21k | £363.73k | £414.09k | £370.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.65k | £155.05k | £301.43k | £364.49k | £441.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.82k | £28.42k | |
|
Income from government grants | £112.89k | £291.99k | £95.83k | £85.49k | £190.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Mar 2018 as amended on 19 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE ACCESS TO AND PARTICIPATION IN THE VISUAL ARTS IN NEWHAM, LONDON AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES, WHERE SUCH ACCESS AND PARTICIPATION ARE OTHERWISE LACKING IN THE COMMUNITY; AND 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND/OR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES OR WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO AND PARTICIPATION IN THE VISUAL ARTS FROM ITS CENTRE IN NEWHAM, LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Hamilton Road
London
E15 3AE
- Phone:
- 02075111117
- Email:
- info@rosettaarts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window