Financial history COPT OAK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 510291
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.46k £3.35k £3.95k £7.50k £12.99k
Total expenditure £5.43k £5.83k £2.60k £4.29k £5.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A