THEIR VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty for victims of Modern-Day Slavery and Human Trafficking or those at risk of being trafficked by; - a) Supplying products to meet their daily needs. b) Providing essentials for new-born babies and pregnant women. c) Promoting awareness of Human Trafficking and Modern Slavery. d) Providing education, advice and information. e) Providing emotional & life skill advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Harvey-Afuwape | Chair | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Debra Weekes | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Urmi Raval | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN ANN THOM | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Seema Kohli | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Thom | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.59k | £59.35k | £40.23k | £56.46k | £289.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.98k | £62.19k | £50.78k | £60.88k | £293.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO HELP RELIEVE POVERTY IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR VICTIMS OF MODERN SLAVERY AND HUMAN TRAFFICKING OR THOSE AT RISK OF BEING TRAFFICKED BY: - A) SUPPLYING MEN, WOMEN AND CHILDREN WITH PRODUCTS TO MEET THEIR DAILY NEEDS. B) PROVIDING ESSENTIALS FOR NEW BORN BABIES AND PREGNANT WOMEN. C) PROMOTING AWARENESS IN HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND MODERN SLAVERY OF MEN, WOMEN AND CHILDREN. D) PROVIDING EDUCATION, ADVICE AND INFORMATION. E) PROVIDING EMOTIONAL AND LIFE SKILL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Officers Mess
Coldstream Road
CATERHAM
Surrey
CR3 5QX
- Phone:
- 07474204408
- Email:
- info@theirvoice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window