AL-JAMIATUL ISLAMIYAH DARUL ULOOM LANCASHIRE U.K.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
h
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
Governance
- 07 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BASHIR AHMED ISMAIL | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 447 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 447 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 813 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 813 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1178 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1178 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1543 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1543 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND BELIEFS OF AHLE SUNNAT WAL JAMAT-HANAFI MADJHAB AND OF THE DEOBANDI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT BELIEVING IN THE TABLIGHI JAMAT. THE TRUST SHALL TRY TO ACHIEVE THE ABOVE OBJECTS BY: (A) ESTABLISHING A COLLEGE OF FURTHER EDUCATION FOR THE TEACHING OF THE HOLY QUR'AN, TAFSEER (INTERPRETATION OF THE HOLY QUR'AN), HADITH (TRADITIONS OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMED (PEACE BE UPON HIM), FIQH (ISLAMIC JURISPRUDENCE), AQAEED (ISLAMIC BELIEFS) HIFZ, QARI AND OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS TO MUSLIM STUDENTS. (B) ESTABLISHING A MOSQUE AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND FACILITATE OTHER ACTIVITIES ALLIED TO THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE BELIEFS AND INSTITUTIONS OF ISLAM. (C) ESTABLISHING A SCHOOL FOR SECULAR EDUCATION AT SECONDARY LEVEL UP TO THE AGE OF SIXTEEN YEARS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al-Jamiatul Islamiyah
willow Lane
Dean
Bolton
BL3 4HF
- Phone:
- 0120462622
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window