Financial history BISHOP'S STORTFORD COMMUNITY CENTRES CIO

Charity Number: 1173860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £85.04k £58.91k £157.25k £124.98k £135.60k
Total expenditure £72.14k £57.41k £89.40k £143.22k £148.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.48k £16.00k N/A N/A