Trustees BISHOP'S STORTFORD COMMUNITY CENTRES CIO
Charity number: 1173860

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr John Wyllie | Chair | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Roque | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Burlison | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Knowles | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Wood | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Saul Segal | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Erica Bromley | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ayoyinka Akande | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.