Accounts and annual returns COLLECTIONS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1175630
Charity reporting is overdue by 954 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 223 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 223 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 589 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 589 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 954 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 954 days
Annual return 30 November 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 15 December 2020 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required