ADASS YESHURUN SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to advance the orthodox Jewish religion in local area for the benefit of the public through the provision and maintenance of a synagogue, the conducting of religious ceremonies, the holding of prayer meetings, lectures and public celebration of religious festivals. Contributing to the spiritual and moral education of children. Relieving poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 28 July 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noson Kohn | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
MOISHE BAMBERGER | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|||||
HENRY BRYSH | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.37k | £98.16k | £116.74k | £133.81k | £142.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.37k | £89.63k | £103.24k | £123.19k | £133.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION IN MANCHESTER AND SALFORD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A SYNAGOGUE, THE CONDUCTING OF RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES, THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURESAND PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS. CONTRIBUTING TO THE SPIRITUAL AND MORAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN. RELIEVING POVERTY AS A PRACTICAL EXPRESSION OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS
Contact information
- Address:
-
YESHRUN SYNAGOGUE
CHELTENHAM CRESCENT
SALFORD
M7 4FP
- Phone:
- 07989303793
- Email:
- adassyeshurun@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window