PENYGROES COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1173727
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Penygroes community centre is a hub of the community and provides groups for all ages such as mother and toddler, youth clubs, over 60s groups and many more.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Carmarthenshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 July 2017: Standard registration
  • 30 November 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not submitted