OSPREY LEADERSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Inspiring and engaging people with nature and creating the conservation leaders of the future through a programme of innovative and exciting opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- The Gambia
Governance
- 11 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Davis | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Danielle Shakespeare | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Frances Cooper | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria June Mander | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI JANE ATKIN | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MEGAN MARIE ALLEN | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.85k | £11.28k | £9.76k | £13.53k | £23.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.73k | £7.83k | £9.54k | £15.41k | £16.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF NATURE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION NATURE CONSERVATION. (2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE ENGAGED IN OR WISHING TO BECOME ENGAGED IN NATURE CONSERVATION OR ANY RELATED TRADE OR PROFESSION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CIO THINKS FIT, INCLUDING BY: A. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. B. PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION IN NATURE CONSERVATION OR A RELATED TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (3) TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CIO THINKS FIT ANY CHARITY WHOSE CHARITABLE PURPOSES ARE THE SAME AS OR SIMILAR TO THOSE OF THE CIO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Audit Hall Road
Empingham
OAKHAM
Rutland
LE15 8PH
- Phone:
- 07739 314794
- Email:
- info@ospreylf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window