THE FRIENDS OF YSGOL PLAS BRONDYFFRYN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support teachers and children at Ysgol Plas Brondyffryn, a special needs school serving autistic spectrum children in North Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 05 August 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Buxton | Chair | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Tipney-Hicks | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Hollingworth | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Harris | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Jane Pugh | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.19k | £2.16k | £2.38k | £259 | £3.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £541 | £3.51k | £389 | £993 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 NOVEMBER 1975 AS AMENDED 10 JULY 1980 as amended on 12 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF BOTH BAY AND RESIDENTIAL PUPILS OF "YSGOL PLAS BRONDYFFRYN" NOT NORMALL PROVIDED BY THE L.E.A.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ysgol Plas Bron Dyffryn
Park Street
DENBIGH
LL16 3DR
- Phone:
- 01745813914
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window