BREAST CANCER KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to provide the following to the people of Kent and East Sussex; protection and promotion of health, relief of those in ill-health as a result of breast cancer, promotion of research into the nature, causes, diagnosis, prevention and treatment of breast cancer and the advancement of education through providing training to medical professionals specialising in breast cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 13 December 2017: CIO registration
- 19 November 2018: Funds received from 1054459 THE MID KENT BREAST CANCER RESEARCH APPEAL CHARITA...
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deepika Akolekar | Chair | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Stevens | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gabrielle Chesover | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michal Uhercik | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Freeman | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mallett | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eleonora Grandi | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Randall | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colm Walls | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE TEARE | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUSSELL BURCOMBE | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.57k | £109.79k | £26.68k | £112.00k | £379.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.29k | £11.42k | £10.07k | £10.79k | £123.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM BREAST CANCER AND OTHER BREAST DISEASE IN KENT AND OTHER PARTS OF THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND BY: (A) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES; (B) PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER AND OTHER BREAST DISEASE; AND (C) PROVIDING EDUCATION TO THE PUBLIC REGARDING BREAST CANCER AND OTHER BREAST DISEASE, AND TRAINING TO MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS SPECIALISING IN BREAST CANCER AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Breast Cancer Kent
PO Box 1355
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME14 9UP
- Phone:
- 01622224111
- Email:
- breastcancerkent@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window