Trustees BREAST CANCER KENT
Charity number: 1176249

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deepika Akolekar | Chair | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Stevens | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gabrielle Chesover | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michal Uhercik | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Freeman | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mallett | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eleonora Grandi | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Randall | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colm Walls | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE TEARE | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUSSELL BURCOMBE | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.