RIVER OAKS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Caring for the environment by regenerating and improving a sizeable estate pond and surrounding borders/grass. Raising finance to completely renew a toddler?s play area. Regular cleaning parties in an estate ?ancient? woodland. Fundraising events with both residents and non-residents. Monthly newsletter to residents and non-.residents. Neighbourhood watch with reporting via a Mail2Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 23 November 2017: CIO registration
- RIVER OAKS RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- RORA (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Clare Dyer | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Thwaite | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Shirlow | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Stuart Foster | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRACE RUTH PULMAN | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA KENNICK | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN JAMES LAFFERTY | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA HUGHES | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.78k | £46.28k | £50.08k | £21.38k | £13.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.57k | £43.51k | £44.78k | £25.60k | £20.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.44k | £216 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SOUTH LIVERPOOL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH LIVERPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Marlcroft Drive
Aigburth
LIVERPOOL
LIVERPOOL
Merseyside
L17 6ER
- Phone:
- 07714751032
- Email:
- riveroakscharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window