Financial history OMNOM GROUP LIMITED

Charity number: 1175640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £353.07k £326.52k £289.82k £521.07k £254.20k
Total expenditure £34.12k £421.07k £330.35k £555.14k £253.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £41.16k £94.14k £18.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £222.35k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £280.71k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £18.00k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £555.14k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £18.76k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A